Verdi v. Wilkinson County, GA et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv00408
Filed: December 4, 2006
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 100 Motion to Return Original Copies of Evidence. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/19/2010. (nbp)
January 16, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 1/16/2009. (nbp)
March 2, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 85 Amended Motion; denying 88 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/2/2009. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdi v. Wilkinson County, GA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.