Herring v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Rose Marion Herring
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2007cv00279
Filed: July 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Claude W. Hicks
Presiding Judge: C. Ashley Royal
Nature of Suit: Social Security
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER adopting 22 Report and Recommendations.Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 3/30/09 (dcp)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by Rose Marion Herring. Objections to R&R due by 3/27/2009. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Claude W. Hicks, Jr. on 3/10/09. (CWH)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER advising plaintiff that her complaint will be considered as an appeal of the denial of disability benefits by the Social Security Administration; that she must provide additional information to the court about her claims; and, that the court will hold in abeyance for Thirty (30) Days consideration of her appeal pending her providing the information to the court. Ordered by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 8/3/07. (CWH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herring v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Marion Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?