Snell v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Snell
Defendant: Steve Roberts, Sue Mickens, Taylor and Doctor Rogers
Case Number: 5:2008cv00311
Filed: October 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Claude W. Hicks, Jr.
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 28 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 7/22/2009. (nbp)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RECOMMENDATION to grant 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by defendants. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Claude W. Hicks, Jr. on 6/30/09. (CWH)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER adopting 9 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/13/2009. (nbp)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint, as amended, filed by Charles Edward Snell. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2008. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Claude W. Hicks, Jr. on 11/4/08. (CWH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snell v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Mickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?