Palmer v. Owens et al
Plaintiff: Charles A Palmer
Defendant: Brian Owens and Unknown Individuals
Case Number: 5:2009cv00326
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Claude W. Hicks, Jr.
Presiding Judge: C. Ashley Royal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 52 Report and Recommendations. Defendants Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 47] is GRANTED, and this case ishereby DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 11/22/2011 (lap)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adopting in part 43 Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Ruger is Dismissed from this action. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 9/22/2011 (lap)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Vacating 12 Order and Directing service of a copy of the summons and complaint, along with Plaintiff's pleading at Tab 14 , be served upon Baldwin State Prison Warden Carl Humphrey. Warden Humphrey shall have 30 days from the date of this order to provide the Court with his findings. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 2/9/10. (lap)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 9 Report and Recommendations.Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 12/16/09 (lap)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION re: 1 Complaint filed by Charles A Palmer. Recommendation to Dismiss defendant Owens. ORDER denying 6 MOTION to Produce Evidence with instructions to plaintiff. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Claude W. Hicks, Jr. on 11/4/2009. (mgb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Owens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?