Owners Insurance Company et al v. The Mitchell Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company and Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: The Mitchell Company Inc and Rightway Drywall Inc
Case Number: 5:2009cv00374
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 6/22/2011. (nbp)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs are directed to inform the Court no later than 2/24/2011 if they intend to proceed with this case. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/9/2011. (nbp)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER STAYING CASE until a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss is rendered. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/7/2011. (nbp)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER directing parties to file joint status report not later than 2/4/20ll. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 1/26/2011. (nbp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company et al v. The Mitchell Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mitchell Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rightway Drywall Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?