Hosley v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Ondraws Hosley
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 5:2009cv00379
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Lamar
Presiding Judge: Claude W. Hicks, Jr.
Presiding Judge: C. Ashley Royal
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Counsel is DIRECTED to refund to the Plaintiff the Court's prior award of $3,839.96 in attorney's fees under the EAJA, in accordance with counsel's acknowledgement of his responsibilities thereunder. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/21/2016. (tlh)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Claimant shall receive $3,839.96 in attorney's fees. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 08/02/2011. (tlh)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING 15 Report and Recommendations. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is GRANTED, and the case is REMANDED according to the instructions in the Recommendation. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/18/2011. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hosley v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ondraws Hosley
Represented By: Charles Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?