Jackson v. Burnside et al
Plaintiff: Mark Wayne Jackson
Defendant: Edward H. Burnside and Calvin Ramsey
Case Number: 5:2010cv00073
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Claude W. Hicks, Jr.
Presiding Judge: C. Ashley Royal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ADOPTING 89 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. Case is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/6/2013. (tlh)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER adopting 71 Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Motion is DENIED with regard to the Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment individual capacity claims and GRANTED with regard to all other claims. Order adopting 70 Report and Recommendations and denying 61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/27/2012. (tlh)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 6 Report and Recommendation to Deny 3 Motion to Amend to Joinder of Claims and Joinder of Persons Needed for Just Adjudication. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 4/23/10 (lap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Burnside et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Wayne Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward H. Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?