Lee v. Mylan Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bethani Lee
Defendant: Mylan Inc, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc and Mylan Technologies Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv00361
Filed: October 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 10/28/2011. (tlh)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 Plaintiff's Letter which the Court construes as a Motion to Amend the Complaint and DENYING without prejudice 27 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/26/2011. (tlh)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 4 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 4/15/2011. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Mylan Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethani Lee
Represented By: Alex Simanovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?