Barns v. Butch et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Randall Barns, Sr
Defendant: Butch, Bill Massee, Captain Petty, Hartgrove, C Allen, Pittman, Johnson and Smithwick
Case Number: 5:2010cv00426
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Presiding Judge: Charles H Weigle
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. The Court has reviewed 41 Plaintiff's Objection to the 37 Report and Recommendation. The Court sees no reason to alter any of its previous decisions. Accordingly, the Court's prior rulings stand, and the Court considers this matter closed. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 5/8/2013. (tlh)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 37 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice because the Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/13/2013. (tlh)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER for Response to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hartgrove, Butch, C Allen. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Charles H Weigle on 4/12/12. (mgb)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and ; DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Deadline for Plaintiff's response is 12/2/2011. Ordered by U.S. Mag. Judge Charles H. Weigle on 11/15/2011.(mgb)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR RESPONSE to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hartgrove, Butch, and C. Allen. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Charles H. Weigle on 7/13/2011. (mgb)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING 6 Report and Recommendations and 8 Report and Recommendations. Defendants Pittman, Johnson, Smithwick, Massee, and Petty are dismissed from this action. The only claims allowed to go forward are those against Defendants Hartgrove, Butch, and Allen relating to the alleged assaults on December 9, 2009. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 2/10/2011. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barns v. Butch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Randall Barns, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Massee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?