Fricks v. Upton et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Marvin Fricks
Defendant: Steve Upton, Wayman Henson, Classification Committee, Hoffman, Medlock and Mailroom Staff Members
Case Number: 5:2010cv00458
Filed: November 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Presiding Judge: Charles H Weigle
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER dismissing case. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 6/4/2012. (tlh)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 29 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 17 Motion to Dismiss Complaint subject to the Court's ruling on the Plaintiff's Motion for additional discovery. The Order dismissing the Defendants shall be effective upon the expiration of the 60 day discovery period. Should the Plaintiff fail to ascertain the identities of the Classification Committee and amend his Complaint within the 60 day time period, the Defendants, and the entire case, will be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/19/2012. (tlh)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Report and Recommendations. The Plaintiff's injunctive and declaratory claims, his Eighth-Amendment claims and his access-to-courts claims will all be dismissed; however, the Plaintiff's due-process and first-amendment claims against Warden Upton and Officer Henson will be allowed to proceed and service is ordered upon those Defendants. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/26/2011. (tlh)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay Discovery pending resolution of 17 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Charles H. Weigle on 7/19/2011. (mgb)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to file responsive pleading. Ordered by U.S. Mag Judge Charles H. Weigle on 6/21/2011. (mgb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fricks v. Upton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Marvin Fricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayman Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mailroom Staff Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?