WRIGHT v. WALLER et al
Plaintiff: WILLIE FRANK WRIGHT, JR
Defendant: TAMIKA WALLER, FREELAND, BUTLER and LEE SIMMONS
Case Number: 5:2011cv00394
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Baker
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Presiding Judge: Charles H Weigle
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 70 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The 71 Order of the Court is vacated and this Order stands in its place. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 4/29/2014. (nbp)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 29 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/18/2012. (nbp)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; denying 12 Motion to Amend/Correct; adopting 21 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 8/7/2012. (nbp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. WALLER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE FRANK WRIGHT, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMIKA WALLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?