Bryant v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: EARL A BRYANT
Defendant: Bank of America and MERRILL LYNCH WEALTH MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 5:2012cv00052
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/30/2014. (tlh)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion to Lift the Stay and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The stay is lifted and 1 Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/15/2014. (tlh)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING 13 Motion to Compel. The Plaintiff must pursue arbitration in accordance with the terms of the arbitration agreement and may not do so through this Court. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 10/25/2012. (tlh)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 9/6/2012. (tlh)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Compel; DENYING 5 Motion to Proceed to Trial; GRANTING 6 Motion to Compel Arbitration. This action is STAYED until arbitration has been completed. Defendant's request for attorney's fees is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/10/2012. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL A BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRILL LYNCH WEALTH MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?