ABANIFI v. OUBRE et al
Plaintiff: EMEKA MICHAEL ABANIFI, JR
Defendant: BRIAN OWENS, SHEILA OUBRE, LARRY JORDAN, DOUG UNDERWOOD and NATHAN HANDBERRY
Case Number: 5:2012cv00421
Filed: October 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Presiding Judge: Charles H Weigle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING 45 and 46 Motions for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/11/2014. (tlh)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 35 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 26 Motion to Dismiss. 1 Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/28/2014. (tlh)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re to GRANT 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by NATHAN HANDBERRY, DOUG UNDERWOOD, LARRY JORDAN, WILLIAM GRIFFIN, SHEILA OUBRE Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle on 01/06/14. (ans)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING 12 Report and Recommendations. Defendant Brian Owens is DISMISSED as a party to this action. The Plaintiff's due process and deprivation of personal property claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Plaintiff's claims against the remaining Defendants shall go forward. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 2/19/2013. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABANIFI v. OUBRE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEILA OUBRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG UNDERWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN HANDBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMEKA MICHAEL ABANIFI, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?