ATKINSON v. THOMAS
Plaintiff: JERRICK ATKINSON
Defendant: BRIAN OWENS, GREGORY MCLAUGHLIN, BRANDON THOMAS and CAROL FOWLER
Case Number: 5:2014cv00294
Filed: August 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 45 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/22/2017. (tlh)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING 37 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with his appeal, he must pay the entire $505.00 appellate filing fee. Because Plaintiff has stated that he c annot pay the $505.00 immediately, he must pay using the partial payment plan described under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b). Pursuant to § 1915(b), the prison account custodian where Plaintiff is incarcerated shall cause to be remitted to the C lerk of this Court monthly payments of 20% of the preceding months income credited to Plaintiff's account until the $505.00 appellate filing fee has been paid in full. These funds shall be withheld by the prison account custodian who, on a monthly basis, shall forward the amount withheld from the prisoners account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the total filing fee of $505.00 has been paid. Checks should be made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 9/29/2015 (tlh)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 28 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING as moot 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and DENYING as moot 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 8/10/2015. (tlh)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Report and Recommendations. The Fourth Amendment and Due Process Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment claims against Officer Thomas are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Plaintiff's claims against Officer Fowler, Warden McLaughl in, and Commissioner Owens and claims for injunctive relief are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim against Officer Thomas will go forward. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 9/22/2014. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATKINSON v. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRICK ATKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY MCLAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL FOWLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?