WILLIAMS v. MCLAUGHLIN et al
Plaintiff: RONNIE WILLIAMS
Defendant: GREGORY MCLAUGHLIN, TRACEY MCINTYRE, HENDERSON, SMITH, MANGO, MASTIE JONES and DON BLAKELY
Case Number: 5:2015cv00231
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Presiding Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 37 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is DISMISSED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/10/2017. (tlh)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 13 Report and Recommendations. Defendants McLaughlin, Blakely, and Jones are DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 9/3/2015. (tlh)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RONNIE WILLIAMS; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 1 Complaint, that Defendants McLaughlin, Blakel y, and Jones be DISMISSED. It is ORDERED that service be made on Defendants Supervisor Tracy McIntyre, Sergeant Henderson, Officer Smith, and Officer Mango. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the business manager at Plaintiffs place of incarceration. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 7/15/2015. (lap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. MCLAUGHLIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY MCLAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY MCINTYRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASTIE JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON BLAKELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?