GUEH v. PULASKI STATE PRISON et al
Plaintiff: TANNEH ANGELA GUEH
Defendant: PULASKI STATE PRISON, MELVIN BUTTS, BELINDA DAVIS, CHRISTIAN and GREEN
Case Number: 5:2015cv00386
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Presiding Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and DENYING 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ASTI GREEN. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/19/2018 nunc pro tunc to January 8, 2018. (tlh)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING 52 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/8/2018. (tlh)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING 31 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 21 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/13/2017. (tlh)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING 15 Report and Recommendations. Pulaski State Prison, Davis, Butts, Christian, and Deputy Warden Green are DISMISSED as defendants in this action. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/31/2016. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUEH v. PULASKI STATE PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANNEH ANGELA GUEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PULASKI STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELVIN BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELINDA DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?