BROOKS v. HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Plaintiff: ZALTON BROOKS
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA, CLINTON PERRY, DALE GARY, CARSON, ROGERS and RUMP
Case Number: 5:2015cv00408
Filed: October 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING 52 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING Gary's 49 motion to dismiss. Brookss claims against Gary are DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/30/2017. (tlh)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING in part 40 and 45 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 30 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; and GRANTING 41 Motion to Dismiss. Brooks's claims against Defenda nts Carson, Rogers, and Rumph are DISMISSED without prejudice. Brooks's claims against Defendant Gary in his individual capacity are allowed to proceed. Defendant Perry's motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and Brooks's claims against him are DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/19/2017. (tlh)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING as modified 14 Report and Recommendations and 18 Amended Report and Recommendations; and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 19 Motion to Amend/Correct. The motion to amend is DENIED to th e extent the Plaintiff moves to join Canady. The claims against Houston County Detention Center are DISMISSED with prejudice. The failure-to-protect claim against Perry may proceed. It is ORDERED that service be made on Warden Clinton Perry and that he file an answer or such other response as may be appropriate under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12, 28 U.S.C. § 1915, and the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/6/2016. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOKS v. HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZALTON BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALE GARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?