HUGHES v. POLAR CORP
Plaintiff: JEREMY HUGHES
Defendant: POLAR CORP
Case Number: 5:2016cv00072
Filed: February 15, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Ben Hill
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 9/12/2018. (chc)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 40 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to provide Defendant with the discovery it requests within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions such as dismissing the action or proceeding in whole or in part. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 2/28/2018 (lap)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Take Deposition from Plaintiff Jeremy Hughes. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to respond to Defendants discovery requests within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 11/14/2017 (lap)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 30 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 31 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 7/17/2017 (lap)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 27 Motion for Extension of Time (Discovery to be complete by 11/27/2017; Dispositive motions due by 12/27/2017); denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 27 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/2/2017 (lap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUGHES v. POLAR CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY HUGHES
Represented By: VICTOR SEVERIN ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLAR CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?