JOHNSON v. LEWIS et al
Plaintiff: RICKY J JOHNSON
Defendant: SHARON LEWIS, HOMER BRYSON, MOHAMMAD, CHAUDRAY, FERRELL, TURNER, JOHNSON, JOHN DOE and KEVIN MARLER
Case Number: 5:2016cv00453
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Wilcox
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying 188 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 6/1/2020. (TES)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying 180 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 1/7/2020. (ech)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 69 MOTION to Preserve & 70 MOTION for Sanctions filed by RICKY J JOHNSON; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint & 95 MOTION for Protective Orde r MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RICKY J JOHNSON, 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Amendment filed by HOMER BRYSON, JOHNSON, SHARON LEWIS, FERRELL, 74 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLA IM & 75 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Amendment filed by THOMAS ROBERT TOOLE, DONALD BARROW, DARRELL JAMES HART, CLAYTON TATUM, ALAN CARTER, 85 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM & 86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Amendment filed by CHAUDRAY. Parties may submit objections within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6-25-18. (bdd)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part 7 Report and Recommendations and granting 19 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment and ADA claims may proceed for further factual development. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 9/8/2017 (lap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. LEWIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY J JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMER BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMMAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAUDRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MARLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?