BOAN v. MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC
Plaintiff: JASON A BOAN
Defendant: MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00305
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE TO COUNSEL David Leslie Pardue - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs) Modified on 10/17/2018 (ggs).
October 15, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
October 15, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC ); ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES: The CM/ECF login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name of the ECF user under whose login and password the document is submitted must be preceded by s/ in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. Ex. s/John Doe. The s/ name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. In this instance, the pleading is signed by DAVID L. PARDUE, but was electronically filed by JASON A. BOAN. (ggs)
October 15, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement, ); Case Administrator Deficiency: Disregard notice regarding admissions requirements. Entered in error. (ggs)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL LESLIE B HARTNETT - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
October 15, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC); Notice to Counsel DAVID LESLIE PARDUE Your contact information (Address and telephone, and fax number) in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account. (ggs)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Petition, by MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC with Jury Demand. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint/Petition, filed by JASON A BOAN.(Pardue, David)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Macon Bedroom & Mattress, Inc. shall have up through and including October 12, 2018 to file its response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 9/25/2018. (tlh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint/Petition, by MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC filed by David Leslie Pardue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint)(Pardue, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC by JASON A BOAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Exhibit Pay Stub, #3 Exhibit Notice of Claims, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 09-05-18 text, #6 Exhibit 09-06-18 text)(KASPERS, TYLER)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JASON A BOAN (ggs)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC. (ggs)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS, INC. Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2953080, $400 filed by JASON A BOAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent Form, #2 Exhibit Pay Stub, #3 Exhibit Request for Information, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(KASPERS, TYLER)
August 21, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JASON A BOAN ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, docket corrected by case manager. (ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOAN v. MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON BEDROOM & MATTRESS INC
Represented By: LESLIE B HARTNETT
Represented By: David Leslie Pardue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON A BOAN
Represented By: TYLER BRAND KASPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?