CLINE v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: WANDA D CLINE
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2018cv00347
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement and Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC. for THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (KAMPS, JULIE) Modified docket text to include Jurisdictional Statement on 11/21/2018 (ans).
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(KAMPS, JULIE)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DANIEL P HART on behalf of THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Attorney DANIEL P HART added to party THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA(pty:dft) (HART, DANIEL)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by SAM SCHWARTZ-FENWICK, JULIE M KAMPS (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Admission) (nop)
October 4, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by WANDA D CLINE ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ans)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WANDA D CLINE (ans)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2982558, $400 filed by WANDA D. CLINE (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(PYLES, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLINE v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA D CLINE
Represented By: BRADLEY G PYLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: SAM SCHWARTZ-FENWICK
Represented By: DANIEL P HART
Represented By: JULIE M KAMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?