HARRIS et al v. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: TONY MOORE, JR., RICARDO HARRIS, JORAE SMITH, CHRISTOPHER SHIELDS, DARRELL SMITH, JR., TOMMY GREEN, LEROY HENDERSON, ANDREW SMITH and BRANDON COBB
Defendant: TIMOTHY C. WARD, TERRY BARNARD, TED PHILBIN, GREGORY C DOZIER, CLAY NIX, RICKY MYRICK, GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Warden TOMMY BOWEN, Warden ANTOINE CALDWELL, JAY SANDERS, GEORGIA STATE BOARD OF PARDONS AND PAROLES, JACK "RANDY&quo SAULS and JACK RANDY SAULS
Case Number: 5:2018cv00365
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to ANTOINE CALDWELL (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to RICKY MYRICK (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to TIMOTHY C. WARD (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to JACK RANDY SAULS (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to TED PHILBIN (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to JAY SANDERS (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to GREGORY C DOZIER (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to TERRY BARNARD (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to CLAY NIX (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to GEORGIA STATE BOARD OF PARDONS AND PAROLES (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. as to TOMMY BOWEN (CENTER, CLAUDIA)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RALPH I MILLER (nop)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE (nop)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by AUDREY E STANO (nop)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO (nop)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by CLAUDIA CENTER (nop)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN (nop)
October 19, 2018 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL RALPH I MILLER, NIGAR SHAIKH, ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE, SUSAN MIZNER, CLAUDIA CENTER, ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN, ANNA BITENCOURT, TALILA A LEWIS - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. Electronic notifications have been discontinued until the admissions requirements have been met. (ggs)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Mail Returned - Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement, sent to NIGAR SHAIKH returned as undeliverable. (ggs)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RALPH I MILLER, AUDREY E STANO, ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE, SUSAN MIZNER, CLAUDIA CENTER, ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BRANDON COBB, TOMMY GREEN, RICARDO HARRIS, LEROY HENDERSON, TONY MOORE, JR, CHRISTOPHER SHIELDS, ANDREW SMITH, DARRELL SMITH, JR, JORAE SMITH (ggs)
October 4, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NIGAR SHAIKH, ANNA BITENCOURT, TALILA A LEWIS - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2990755, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(YOUNG, SEAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS et al v. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY C. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY BARNARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TED PHILBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY C DOZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAY NIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKY MYRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden TOMMY BOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden ANTOINE CALDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA STATE BOARD OF PARDONS AND PAROLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK "RANDY&quo SAULS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK RANDY SAULS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY MOORE, JR.
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO HARRIS
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORAE SMITH
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SHIELDS
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL SMITH, JR.
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY GREEN
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEROY HENDERSON
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW SMITH
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON COBB
Represented By: SEAN JENGWEI YOUNG
Represented By: SUSAN MIZNER
Represented By: ZOE BRENNAN-KROHN
Represented By: KOSHA S TUCKER
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA E G SWETTE
Represented By: ANNA BITENCOURT EMILIO
Represented By: TALILA A LEWIS
Represented By: CLAUDIA CENTER
Represented By: AUDREY E STANO
Represented By: RALPH I MILLER
Represented By: NIGAR SHAIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?