VC MACON GA LLC v. VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC
Plaintiff: VC MACON GA LLC
Defendant: VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00385
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case # 5:18-cv-00385 is consolidated with case # 5:18-cv-00388. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/7/2018. (ech)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC filed by ALEXANDER B FEINBERG.(FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III: Evidentiary Hearing held on 10/22/2018. Court Reporter: Debbie Eickhoff.Time in Court: 7 minutes. (chc)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by OLLIE A CLEVELAND, III (nop)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE until further order of this Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/22/2018. (ggs)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WALKER STEVEN STEWART on behalf of VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC Attorney WALKER STEVEN STEWART added to party VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC(pty:dft) (STEWART, WALKER)
October 19, 2018 NOTICE OF SETTING Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/22/2018 at 08:00 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III. (chc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #7 Motion for Hearing. Hearing on Emergency Motion for Hearing on Relief Under Removed Action set for 10/22/2018 08:00 AM in Macon, Georgia, before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/19/2018. (ech)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing by VC MACON GA LLC filed by JON A GOTTLIEB. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(GOTTLIEB, JON)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by VC MACON GA LLC (GOTTLIEB, JON)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VC MACON GA LLC identifying other affiliate DL INVESTMENTS LLC (GOTTLIEB, JON) Modified on 10/19/2018 to add other affiliate. (ggs).
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC identifying Corporate Parent EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA for VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC. (FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to VC MACON GA LLC (ggs)
October 18, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Jurisdictional Statement by VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC (FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against VC MACON GA LLC Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3000588, $400 filed by VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC (Attachments: #1 Removal Documents Declaration of Tres Cleveland, #2 Removal Documents Declaration of Roger Swartzwelder, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VC MACON GA LLC v. VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDER B FEINBERG
Represented By: OLLIE A CLEVELAND, III
Represented By: WALKER STEVEN STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VC MACON GA LLC
Represented By: JON A GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?