VC MACON GA LLC v. VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC et al

Plaintiff: VC MACON GA LLC
Defendant: EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA and VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC
Undetermined: JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY
Case Number: 5:2018cv00388
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
0 Judge: TILMAN E SELF
1 Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 106 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, by Chula Vista Center, LLC, National Retail Properties, LP, Pierre Bossier Anchor Acquisition, LLC, Valley Plaza Mall, LP. Filing fee $ 505, Receipt No.: 113G-3043341. (WALKER, STUART)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 105 ORDER: The Court grants #101 Receiver's Assented to Motion for Authority to Borrow Funds. Accordingly, the Court authorizes the Receiver to obtain Ninth Amendment Term Loans and grants security interests and liens. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ech)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 104 ORDER Supplemental Order re #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ech)
December 12, 2018 103 NOTICE Withdrawal of Limited Objection by Las Vegas Associates, LLLP re #48 Memorandum in Opposition,, #88 Memorandum in Opposition, (SCHUTT, FREDERICK)
December 12, 2018 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Stewart Cathey on behalf of Eagle Cleaning Service, Inc. Attorney Matthew Stewart Cathey added to party Eagle Cleaning Service, Inc.(pty:ip) (Cathey, Matthew)
December 12, 2018 101 MOTION Obtain Secured Financing by JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY filed by JAMES F BANTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Ninth Amendment Agreement)(BANTER, JAMES)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 100 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ALLISON H ROGERS (nop)
December 12, 2018 99 RECEIVER'S INITIAL REPORT filed by JAMES F BANTER (BANTER, JAMES) Modified on 12/12/2018 to add document description. (ggs).
December 11, 2018 98 MEMORANDUM in Support of #45 MOTION to Vacate #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (DenGar Belt LLLP's Joinder to Motion to Vacate Injunction and Receivership Order) (ELROD, JOHN)
December 11, 2018 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHRISTINE MH WELLONS on behalf of Maryland Higher Education Commission Attorney CHRISTINE MH WELLONS added to party Maryland Higher Education Commission(pty:ip) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(WELLONS, CHRISTINE)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 96 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JONATHAN M KAMIN (nop)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 95 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by J JULIUS BOLOCK (nop)
December 11, 2018 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J JULIUS BOLOCK on behalf of iPenn Ventures,L.P. Attorney J JULIUS BOLOCK added to party iPenn Ventures,L.P.(pty:dft) (BOLOCK, J JULIUS)
December 11, 2018 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DANA S PLON on behalf of BH Franklin LLLP Attorney DANA S PLON added to party BH Franklin LLLP(pty:ip) (PLON, DANA)
December 11, 2018 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DANA S PLON on behalf of 3000 Market LP Attorney DANA S PLON added to party 3000 Market LP(pty:ip) (PLON, DANA)
December 11, 2018 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WILLIAM J HOLLEY, II on behalf of National University Attorney WILLIAM J HOLLEY, II added to party National University(pty:ip) (HOLLEY, WILLIAM)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 90 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by LEX M ERWIN (nop)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 89 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by STUART M BROWN (nop)
December 11, 2018 88 ***WITHDRAWN - SEE WITHDRAWAL AT TAB 103*** MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Limited Objection to Order Appointing Receiver and Preliminary Injunction #48 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Receiver)(SCHUTT, FREDERICK) Modified on 12/12/2018 (ggs).
December 11, 2018 87 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by BSF RICHMOND, L.P. re #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, #50 Notice (Other), #49 RESPONSE to Court Order, #21 Response to Motion (WOLGAST, LISA)
December 11, 2018 86 AFFIDAVIT re #60 RESPONSE to Court Order by R&W Rentals, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Guaranty)(ERWIN, LEX)
December 11, 2018 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOHN D ELROD on behalf of DenGar Belt, LLLP Attorney JOHN D ELROD added to party DenGar Belt, LLLP(pty:ip) (ELROD, JOHN)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 84 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JOE A JOSEPH (nop)
December 11, 2018 83 MOTION for Joinder by LBA BALBOA, LLC, LBA FUND IV, LLC filed by Gregory K. Smith.(Smith, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 82 NOTICE of Order granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Attorneys Drew M Dillworth and Kristopher E Pearson. Parties need to efile notices of appearance. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Admission)(nop)
December 11, 2018 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by THOMAS EDWARD AUSTIN, JR on behalf of Palisades Birmingham, LLC Attorney THOMAS EDWARD AUSTIN, JR added to party Palisades Birmingham, LLC(pty:dft) (AUSTIN, THOMAS)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 80 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BRET P SHAFFER (nop)
December 11, 2018 79 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by Chula Vista Center, LLC, Pierre Bossier Anchor Acquisition, LLC, Valley Plaza Mall, LP re #45 MOTION to Vacate #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (WALKER, STUART)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 78 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RYAN T WAGGONER (nop)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 77 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BONNIE H ROTHELL (nop)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 76 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by HOWARD C RUBIN (nop)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 75 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ERIC J LORENZINI (nop)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 74 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANGELA M BUTCHER (nop)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 73 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by FREDERICK H SCHUTT (nop)
December 11, 2018 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRIAN P WELCH on behalf of Southern Plaza, LLC (WELCH, BRIAN)
December 10, 2018 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by RYAN T WAGGONER on behalf of 15350/15400 Sherman Reverse, LLC Attorney RYAN T WAGGONER added to party 15350/15400 Sherman Reverse, LLC(pty:3pd) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(WAGGONER, RYAN)
December 10, 2018 70 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by National Retail Properties, LP re #45 MOTION to Vacate #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (WALKER, STUART)
December 7, 2018 69 MOTION for Joinder by CMS EDU II SPARTANBURG, L.P. filed by MICHAEL J THOMERSON.(THOMERSON, MICHAEL)
December 7, 2018 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL J THOMERSON on behalf of CMS EDU II SPARTANBURG, L.P. Attorney MICHAEL J THOMERSON added to party CMS EDU II SPARTANBURG, L.P.(pty:ip) (THOMERSON, MICHAEL)
December 7, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #67 Notice of Attorney Appearance, filed by AMERICAN AUTO WASH EXPRESS, LLC, AMERICAN AUTO WASH, LLC, FOAMZONE, LLC ); Notice to Counsel - (BETH A. MOELLER) Your contact information (ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE (case manager updated your e-mail address)) in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account. (ggs)
December 7, 2018 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Beth A. Moeller on behalf of FOAMZONE, LLC, AMERICAN AUTO WASH, LLC, AMERICAN AUTO WASH EXPRESS, LLC Attorney Beth A. Moeller added to party FOAMZONE, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Beth A. Moeller added to party AMERICAN AUTO WASH, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Beth A. Moeller added to party AMERICAN AUTO WASH EXPRESS, LLC(pty:ip) (Moeller, Beth)
December 6, 2018 66 AFFIDAVIT re #62 MOTION to Vacate of Thomas D. Gordon in Support of the Don Levin Trust Motion to Vacate by THOMAS P. GALLAGHER, THOMAS D. GORDON (LORENZINI, ERIC)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 65 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/6/2018 (chc)
December 5, 2018 64 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by THOMAS P. GALLAGHER re #62 MOTION to Vacate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Initial Lease Agreement dated April 12, 2012, #2 Exhibit First Amendment to Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit Notice of Assignment of Lease Agreement dated April 12, 2012)(LORENZINI, ERIC)
December 5, 2018 63 NOTICE ERRATA by THOMAS P. GALLAGHER, THOMAS D. GORDON re #62 MOTION to Vacate (LORENZINI, ERIC)
December 4, 2018 62 MOTION to Vacate by THOMAS P. GALLAGHER, THOMAS D. GORDON filed by ERIC J LORENZINI. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo of Law in Suppoert of Don Levin Trust to Vacate the Preliminary Injunction and Receivership Order, #2 Exhibit Virginia College Alabama Order Denying Preliminary Injunction and Receivership, #3 Exhibit St. Louis Order Appointing Receiver)(LORENZINI, ERIC)
December 4, 2018 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ERIC J LORENZINI on behalf of THOMAS P. GALLAGHER, THOMAS D. GORDON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing USDC Central District of CA)(LORENZINI, ERIC)
December 4, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #56 Motion to Vacate filed by THOMAS D. GORDON, THOMAS P. GALLAGHER ); Document must be refiled to include a description of exhibit(s). Generic descriptions of exhibits (i.e. Exhibit or Exhibit A) are not permitted. (ggs)
December 3, 2018 60 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by R&W Rentals, LLC re #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, #45 MOTION to Vacate #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (ERWIN, LEX)
December 3, 2018 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LEX ERWIN on behalf of R&W Rentals, LLC Attorney LEX ERWIN added to party R&W Rentals, LLC(pty:ip) (ERWIN, LEX)
December 3, 2018 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory K. Smith on behalf of LBA BALBOA, LLC, LBA FUND IV, LLC Attorney Gregory K. Smith added to party LBA BALBOA, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Gregory K. Smith added to party LBA FUND IV, LLC(pty:ip) (Smith, Gregory)
December 3, 2018 57 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by CKS-VCC, LLC re #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (KURTZ, RYAN)
December 3, 2018 NOTICE OF RESETTING Status Conference previously set for 12/5/2018 is now reset for 12/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III. Call in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record.(chc)
December 3, 2018 56 ***TERMINATED - REFILED AT TAB 62*** MOTION to Vacate by THOMAS P. GALLAGHER, THOMAS D. GORDON filed by ERIC J LORENZINI. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(LORENZINI, ERIC) Modified on 12/4/2018 (ggs).
December 3, 2018 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ERIC J LORENZINI on behalf of THOMAS D. GORDON, THOMAS P. GALLAGHER Attorney ERIC J LORENZINI added to party THOMAS D. GORDON(pty:3pd), Attorney ERIC J LORENZINI added to party THOMAS P. GALLAGHER(pty:3pd) (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vic, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(LORENZINI, ERIC) Modified on 12/4/2018 to include description of exhibits. (ggs).
December 3, 2018 54 RESPONSE filed by VC MACON GA LLC re #46 MOTION for Attorney Fees (GOTTLIEB, JON)
December 3, 2018 53 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by FEDERAL REALTY INVESTMENT TRUST re #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined Copy of Order)(MCLEOD, CHESLEY)
December 3, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #46 Report; Wrong event used, the correct event is "MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES" - No need to refile, for future reference only. This docket entry has been corrected by the case manager. (ggs)
December 3, 2018 52 NOTICE Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Petition to Intervene by Southern Plaza, LLC (WOLGAST, LISA)
December 3, 2018 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAFFER, BRET)
December 3, 2018 50 NOTICE Joinder to Motion to Vacate the Injunctionand Receivership Order by Southern Plaza, LLC re #45 MOTION to Vacate #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (WOLGAST, LISA)
December 3, 2018 49 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by Southern Plaza, LLC re #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (Attachments: #1 Proposed revisions to Receivership Order)(WOLGAST, LISA)
December 2, 2018 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, Limited Opposition of Las Vegas Associates, LLLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Lease Agreement between Las Vegas Associates LLLP and Heritage-Khec, Inc. as of 9/1/2009, #2 Exhibit 2 - Guaranty of Lease, #3 Exhibit 3 - Acknowledgment and Consent to Transfer Under Lease Agreement and Second Amendment to Lease and Amendment to Guaranty)(LOWTHER, PATRICK) Modified on 12/4/2018 to add description of exhibits. (ggs).
November 30, 2018 47 MEMORANDUM in Support of #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Yael D. Aufgang, #2 Exhibit Ipenn v. Virginia College Complaint, #3 Exhibit Burnham Properties v. Virginia College Complaint, #4 Exhibit Las Vegas letter)(Threadcraft, Joshua)
November 30, 2018 46 MOTION for Attorneys Fees filed by JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY (KENNEDY, JOHN) Modified on 12/3/2018 to correct event type. (ggs).
November 30, 2018 45 MOTION to Vacate #26 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, by Chula Vista Center, LLC, National Retail Properties, LP, Pierre Bossier Anchor Acquisition, LLC, Valley Plaza Mall, LP filed by STUART WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate or, in the alternative, to Modify the November 14, 2018, Receivership Order)(WALKER, STUART)
November 30, 2018 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by STUART WALKER on behalf of Valley Plaza Mall, LP, Chula Vista Center, LLC, Pierre Bossier Anchor Acquisition, LLC Attorney STUART WALKER added to party Valley Plaza Mall, LP(pty:ip), Attorney STUART WALKER added to party Chula Vista Center, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney STUART WALKER added to party Pierre Bossier Anchor Acquisition, LLC(pty:ip) (WALKER, STUART)
November 30, 2018 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PATRICK L LOWTHER on behalf of Las Vegas Associates, LLLP Attorney PATRICK L LOWTHER added to party Las Vegas Associates, LLLP(pty:ip) (LOWTHER, PATRICK)
November 30, 2018 42 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/14/2018, before Judge TILLMAN E. SELF, III. Court Reporter SALLY GRAY. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (slg)
November 30, 2018 41 NOTICE Notice of Filing Bond of Receiver by JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY (KENNEDY, JOHN)
November 29, 2018 40 ***DISREGARD (Document incomplete) - REFILED AT TAB 41*** NOTICE Notice of Filing Bond of Receiver by John Flanders Kennedy (KENNEDY, JOHN) Modified on 11/30/2018 (ggs).
November 29, 2018 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTRA REALTY COMPANY INC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAFFER, BRET)
November 29, 2018 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEBO REALTY LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAFFER, BRET)
November 29, 2018 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRET PATRICK SHAFFER on behalf of LEBO REALTY LP, ELECTRA REALTY COMPANY INC Attorney BRET PATRICK SHAFFER added to party LEBO REALTY LP(pty:ip), Attorney BRET PATRICK SHAFFER added to party ELECTRA REALTY COMPANY INC(pty:ip) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAFFER, BRET)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 36 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by J LELAND MURPHREE (nop)
November 28, 2018 REMARK: Call in instructions will be sent via email to all counsel of record for 12/5/2018 telephone conference to begin at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Tilman E. Self, III. (chc)
November 27, 2018 35 NOTICE Notice of Compliance by John Flanders Kennedy (BANTER, JAMES)
November 27, 2018 34 NOTICE Oath and Acceptance by John Flanders Kennedy (BANTER, JAMES)
November 27, 2018 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHESLEY S MCLEOD on behalf of PIONEER INDUSTRIAL LLC, PIONEER PARKING LOT LLC Attorney CHESLEY S MCLEOD added to party PIONEER INDUSTRIAL LLC(pty:ip), Attorney CHESLEY S MCLEOD added to party PIONEER PARKING LOT LLC(pty:ip) (MCLEOD, CHESLEY)
November 27, 2018 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHESLEY S MCLEOD on behalf of FEDERAL REALTY INVESTMENT TRUST Attorney CHESLEY S MCLEOD added to party FEDERAL REALTY INVESTMENT TRUST(pty:ip) (MCLEOD, CHESLEY)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III.(chc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 31 ORDER concerning pro hac vice admission. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/16/2018. (chc)
November 16, 2018 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by IVY NEAL CADLE on behalf of Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC Attorney IVY NEAL CADLE added to party Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC(pty:ip) (CADLE, IVY)
November 16, 2018 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by STUART WALKER on behalf of National Retail Properties, LP Attorney STUART WALKER added to party National Retail Properties, LP(pty:ip) (WALKER, STUART)
November 14, 2018 28 Defendant's Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Student Declarations, #2 Exhibit 2 - Student Declarations, #3 Exhibit 3 - Student Declarations, #4 Exhibit 4 - Student Declarations, #5 Exhibit 5 - Student Declarations, #6 Exhibit 6 - Student Declarations, #7 Exhibit 7 - Student Declarations)(vs)
November 14, 2018 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III: Status Conference held on 11/14/2018 Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (vs)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER AND PRELIMIINARY INJUNCTION granting #10 Motion to Appoint Receiver. It is Ordered that JOHN F. KENNEDY of Macon, Georgia is hereby appointed Receiver. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/14/2018. (ggs)
November 14, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #25 Notice (Other) filed by VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC, EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA ); Proposed orders are not to be filed on the docket, but are to be e-mailed in a word processing format to the appropriate divisional clerks office. Please submit the proposed order via e-mail to macon.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. (ggs)
November 14, 2018 25 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE Proposed Order Appointing Receiver by EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC (STEWART, WALKER) Modified on 11/14/2018 (ggs).
November 14, 2018 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cater C. Thompson on behalf of Kaplan Higher Education, LLC, Kaplan, Inc. Attorney Cater C. Thompson added to party Kaplan Higher Education, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Cater C. Thompson added to party Kaplan, Inc.(pty:ip) (Thompson, Cater)
November 14, 2018 23 AMENDED NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOE A JOSEPH on behalf of Kaplan Higher Education, LLC, Kaplan, Inc. (JOSEPH, JOE) Modified on 11/14/2018 to add additional docket text. (ggs).
November 14, 2018 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOE A JOSEPH on behalf of Kaplan Higher Education, LLC, Kaplan, Inc. Attorney JOE A JOSEPH added to party Kaplan Higher Education, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney JOE A JOSEPH added to party Kaplan, Inc.(pty:ip) (JOSEPH, JOE)
November 13, 2018 21 RESPONSE filed by Southern Plaza, LLC re #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (WOLGAST, LISA)
November 13, 2018 20 RESPONSE filed by VC MACON GA LLC re #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (GOTTLIEB, JON)
November 13, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #16 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Kaplan Higher Education, LLC, Kaplan, Inc. ); Petitions to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice are not to be docketed as a motion. Instructions for submitting the petition are located on the Court's website. In this instance the admissions clerk has been notified that the petition has been filed as a motion in this case, and it will be processed. The motion has been terminated. NO NEED TO RESUBMIT THE PETITION. (ggs)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 19 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by OLLIE A CLEVELAND, III (nop)
November 9, 2018 18 NOTICE Notice of Compliance by EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Matrix)(FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)
November 9, 2018 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRENDA T CUBBAGE on behalf of Kennington Valley View LLC Attorney BRENDA T CUBBAGE added to party Kennington Valley View LLC(pty:ip) (CUBBAGE, BRENDA)
November 8, 2018 16 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joe A. Joseph by Kaplan Higher Education, LLC, Kaplan, Inc. filed by Joshua Howard Threadcraft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing)(Threadcraft, Joshua) Modified on 11/13/2018 (ggs).
November 8, 2018 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Howard Threadcraft on behalf of Kaplan, Inc., Kaplan Higher Education, LLC Attorney Joshua Howard Threadcraft added to party Kaplan, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Joshua Howard Threadcraft added to party Kaplan Higher Education, LLC(pty:ip) (Threadcraft, Joshua)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE Lead Case # 5:18-CV-388. Member Case # 5:18-CV-385. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/7/2018. (ggs)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #10 Emergency Motion for the Appointment of a Receiver and Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. At this time, the Court only grants the motion as it pertains to temporary injunctive relief. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule 1 to Order Granting Temporary Injunctive Relief) (ech)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE OF SETTING Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III. (chc)
November 7, 2018 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III: Motion Hearing held on 11/7/2018 re #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC, EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA and #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC, EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA. Court Reporter: Darlene Fuller.Time in Court: 1 hour 10 minutes. (chc)
November 7, 2018 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JAY CLIFFORD TRAYNHAM on behalf of EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC Attorney JAY CLIFFORD TRAYNHAM added to party EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA(pty:dft), Attorney JAY CLIFFORD TRAYNHAM added to party VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC(pty:dft) (TRAYNHAM, JAY)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver: Motion Hearing previously set for 11/8/2018 at 2:00 p.m. is NOW re-set for 11/7/2018 at 04:00 PM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III. (chc)
November 6, 2018 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver: Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 at 02:00 PM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III. (chc)
November 6, 2018 10 EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Receiver by EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC filed by WALKER STEVEN STEWART. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Ranchino, #2 Exhibit ECA's leased real estate, #3 Exhibit List of Go-Forward Schools, #4 Exhibit List of Teach-Out Schools)(STEWART, WALKER)
November 5, 2018 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC filed by ALEXANDER B FEINBERG.(FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)
November 5, 2018 8 ANSWER to Complaint by EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC.(FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)
November 1, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VC MACON GA LLC as to EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA. (GOTTLIEB, JON)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER STAYING CASE until further order from the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/24/2018. (ggs)
October 23, 2018 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WALKER STEVEN STEWART on behalf of EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC Attorney WALKER STEVEN STEWART added to party EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA(pty:dft), Attorney WALKER STEVEN STEWART added to party VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC(pty:dft) (STEWART, WALKER)
October 23, 2018 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL no longer assigned to the case. (ggs)
October 18, 2018 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to VC MACON GA LLC (ggs)
October 18, 2018 3 Jurisdictional Statement by EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC (FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)
October 18, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC (FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)
October 18, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against VC MACON GA LLC Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3001425, $400 filed by EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC (Attachments: #1 Removal Documents Declaration of Tres Cleveland, #2 Removal Documents Declaration of Roger Swartzwelder, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(FEINBERG, ALEXANDER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VC MACON GA LLC v. VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDUCATION CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: ALEXANDER B FEINBERG
Represented By: JAY CLIFFORD TRAYNHAM
Represented By: STUART M BROWN
Represented By: WALKER STEVEN STEWART
Represented By: OLLIE A CLEVELAND, III
Represented By: J LELAND MURPHREE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA COLLEGE LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDER B FEINBERG
Represented By: JAY CLIFFORD TRAYNHAM
Represented By: J LELAND MURPHREE
Represented By: STUART M BROWN
Represented By: WALKER STEVEN STEWART
Represented By: OLLIE A CLEVELAND, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VC MACON GA LLC
Represented By: JON A GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY
Represented By: JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES F BANTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?