CHESNUT v. COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE, et al

Plaintiff: CYNTHIA FLEMING CHESNUT
Defendant: COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE, COUNTRY CAPITAL SERVICES INC and MICHAEL SEHRINGER
Case Number: 5:2018cv00404
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Defendants. as to MICHAEL SEHRINGER (Van Dyke, Christopher)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Defendants. as to COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE (Van Dyke, Christopher)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Defendants. as to COUNTRY CAPITAL SERVICES INC (Van Dyke, Christopher)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Todd Van Dyke on behalf of COUNTRY CAPITAL SERVICES INC, COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE, MICHAEL SEHRINGER Attorney Christopher Todd Van Dyke added to party COUNTRY CAPITAL SERVICES INC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Todd Van Dyke added to party COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Todd Van Dyke added to party MICHAEL SEHRINGER(pty:dft) (Van Dyke, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COUNTRY CAPITAL SERVICES INC (vs)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for MICHAEL SEHRINGER (vs)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE (vs)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COUNTRY CAPITAL SERVICES INC, COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE, MICHAEL SEHRINGER (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Michael Sehringer, #2 USM 285 Country Capital services, Inc.)(vs)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court ORDERS service on the Defendants by the United States Marshals Service. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 11/2/2018. (kat)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CYNTHIA FLEMING CHESNUT (vs)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by CYNTHIA FLEMING CHESNUT.(vs)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COUNTRY CAPITAL SERVICES INC, COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE, MICHAEL SEHRINGER,filed by CYNTHIA FLEMING CHESNUT. (Attachments: #1 Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHESNUT v. COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA FLEMING CHESNUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTRY FINANCIAL INSURANCE
Represented By: Christopher Todd Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTRY CAPITAL SERVICES INC
Represented By: Christopher Todd Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SEHRINGER
Represented By: Christopher Todd Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?