COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA v. BUTTS COUNTY GEORGIA, et al
Plaintiff: COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, DR MONIQUE Y TATE, LAMAR PERRYMAN, TALIYAH MAHLI, MYEL TATE-BENSON, PRINCIPAL CHIEFTESS BLUE FEATHER, PRINCIPAL CHIEF RED MAN, CHIEFTESS RAGING WIND, CATE HONVNWV, CHIEFTESS AHNIWIDU and SAHANI UGIDAHLI
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES, RANDOLPH COUNTY GEORGIA, SECRETARY OF THE STATE OF GEORGIA, PUTNAM COUNTY GEORGIA, DISTRICT ATTORNEY CHEROKEE COUNTY GEORGIA, BUTTS COUNTY GEORGIA, BARTOW COUNTY GEORGIA, AUGUSTA-RICHMOND COUNTY GEORGIA, QUITMAN COUNTY GEORGIA, CHATHAM COUNTY GEORGIA, GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF GEORGIA, MUSCOGEE COUNTY GEORGIA, COMMISSIONER OF GEORGIA DOE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, ATHENS-CLARKE COUNTY GEORGIA, DOUGHERTY COUNTY GEORGIA, COMMISSIONER OF GEORGIA DNR, GEORGIA COUNCIL ON AMERICAN INDIAN CONCERNS, CHATTAHOOCHEE COUNTY GEORGIA, FULTON COUNTY GEORGIA, DEKALB COUNTY GEORGIA, STEWART COUNTY GEORGIA, GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF GEORGIA, WEBSTER COUNTY GEORGIA, MCINTOSH COUNTY GEORGIA, SEMINOLE COUNTY GEORGIA, COWETA COUNTY GEORGIA and CHEROKEE COUNTY GEORGIA
Case Number: 5:2018cv00471
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 USCA Case Number 19-10552-B re #11 Notice of Appeal, filed by MYEL TATE-BENSON, MONIQUE Y TATE, LAMAR PERRYMAN, COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, TALIYAH MAHLI. (ggs)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Additional copy of Notice of Appeal (USCA forwarded Notice of Appeal that was mailed to them and received on 2/13/2019) by COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, TALIYAH MAHLI, LAMAR PERRYMAN, MONIQUE Y TATE, MYEL TATE-BENSON re #11 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #11 Notice of Appeal, #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #10 Judgment Judge Appealed: Tilman E. Self, III. Court Reporter: N/A. Fee: NOT PAID (IFP Granted but complaint dismissed as frivolus). (ggs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Judgment by COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, TALIYAH MAHLI, LAMAR PERRYMAN, MONIQUE Y TATE, MYEL TATE-BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter from USCA forwarding notice of appeal to district court)(ggs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT (ggs)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 , #6 , #7 and #8 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis but dismissing #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint as frivolous without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 02/05/2019. (chc)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by MONIQUE Y TATE. (Attachments: #1 Petition in Support, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by MYEL TATE-BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Petition in Support, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TALIYAH MAHLI. (Attachments: #1 Petition in Support, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by LAMAR PERRYMAN. (Attachments: #1 Petition in Support, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay the required filing fee within 14 days of this order or risk dismissal of this action. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 01/15/2019. (chc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, TALIYAH MAHLI, LAMAR PERRYMAN, MONIQUE Y TATE, MYEL TATE-BENSON (ggs)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, TALIYAH MAHLI, LAMAR PERRYMAN, MONIQUE Y TATE, MYEL TATE-BENSON.(ggs)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MYEL TATE-BENSON, COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, LAMAR PERRYMAN, MONIQUE Y TATE, TALIYAH MAHLI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA v. BUTTS COUNTY GEORGIA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDOLPH COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF THE STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUTNAM COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY CHEROKEE COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTTS COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARTOW COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUGUSTA-RICHMOND COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUITMAN COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHATHAM COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF GEORGIA DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENS-CLARKE COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGHERTY COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF GEORGIA DNR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA COUNCIL ON AMERICAN INDIAN CONCERNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHATTAHOOCHEE COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEKALB COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEWART COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEBSTER COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCINTOSH COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEMINOLE COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COWETA COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEROKEE COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR MONIQUE Y TATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAMAR PERRYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALIYAH MAHLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYEL TATE-BENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCIPAL CHIEFTESS BLUE FEATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCIPAL CHIEF RED MAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIEFTESS RAGING WIND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATE HONVNWV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIEFTESS AHNIWIDU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAHANI UGIDAHLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?