HOGAN v. STATE OF GEORGIA
Plaintiff: RICKY LAMAR HOGAN
Defendant: STATE OF GEORGIA, EDMUND J BAZAR, JR, HUGH SMITH, JOSEPH PAUL GILES, GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, SONNY PURDUE, SANDRA LOY, MARK TAYLOR, TERRY L JONES, SHARON LEWIS, STEVE ROBERTS, MEADOWS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC, SAMUEL OLENS, SANDRA S MOORE, CHRISTOPHER M CARR, RAYMOND HEAD, MARK E GUZZI, CHARLENE MARTIN, DERRICK SCHOFIELD, TOM SITTNICK, THURBERT E BAKER, BEN HARVILL, JOHN C JONES, THE STATE OF GEORGIAS COMPOSITE MEDICAL BOARD INC, GREGORY C DOZIER, GEORGIA CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE INC, SARAH DRAPER, Governor NATHAN DEAL, STEVE UPTON, JIM WETHERINGTON, BILLY NICHOLS, J CHAD KNIGHT, GEORGIA REGENTS UNIVERSITY SYSTEMS INC, WILLIAM F AMIDED, BRUCE CHAPMAN, CASEY CAGLE and SANDRA DUNCAN
Case Number: 5:2019cv00135
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN ); Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1.4, an attorney (other than a government attorney) appearing of record in any action pending in this district, who wishes to withdraw as counsel for any party therein, shall submit a written motion for an order of court permitting such withdrawal. This document does not comply with Locate Rule 83.1.4. (cma)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN filed by MCNEILL STOKES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(STOKES, MCNEILL)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE RE: LOCAL RULE 5.5 Pursuant to Local Rule 5.5, the Clerk may not accept pro se filings from represented parties. RICKY LAMAR HOGAN is hereby notified that the Motion for for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing is NOT being filed with the Court. The Motion for for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing will be forwarded to counsel of record MCNEILL STOKES. (bcl)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE RE: LOCAL RULE 5.5 Pursuant to Local Rule 5.5, the Clerk may not accept pro se filings from represented parties. RICKY LAMAR HOGAN is hereby notified that the Amended Motion for an Emergency Mandatory and Preliminary Injunction with Citations is NOT being filed with the Court. The Amended Motion for an Emergency Mandatory and Preliminary Injunction with Citations will be forwarded to counsel of record MCNEILL STOKES. (mdm)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 06/11/2019 (vs)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 *DISREGARD; DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR* MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing Filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(bcl) Modified on 6/13/2019 (bcl).
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN filed by MCNEILL STOKES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(STOKES, MCNEILL)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MCNEILL STOKES on behalf of RICKY LAMAR HOGAN (STOKES, MCNEILL)
May 31, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN, #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN ); Documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. (ans)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 *DISREGARD*MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN filed by MCNEILL STOKES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(STOKES, MCNEILL) Modified on 6/4/2019 Re-filed at #13 Motion (cma).
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 *DISREGARD*NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MCNEILL STOKES on behalf of RICKY LAMAR HOGAN Attorney MCNEILL STOKES added to party RICKY LAMAR HOGAN(pty:pla) (STOKES, MCNEILL) Modified on 6/4/2019 Re-filed at #12 Notice of Attorney Appearance (cma).
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Hearing Filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to RICKY LAMAR HOGAN (cma)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (cma)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Recusal and Disqualification Filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Permit Doctor and Staff of Bush Clinic to Evaluate and Electronically Scan the Plaintiff Within the Immediate Presence of the U.S. District Court During Plaintiff's Emergency Injunctive Hearing re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for an Emergency Mandatory and Preliminary Injunction With Citations Filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN.Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION and AFFIAVIT for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN.Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number GAN500031547 filed by RICKY LAMAR HOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Jurisdiction and Venue, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A Sworn Affidavit, #4 Exhibit B Certified Mail Receipts, #5 Exhibit C Sworn Certificate of Service, #6 Cover Letter, #7 Envelope)(cma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOGAN v. STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY LAMAR HOGAN
Represented By: MCNEILL STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDMUND J BAZAR, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUGH SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH PAUL GILES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONNY PURDUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA LOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY L JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEADOWS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL OLENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA S MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER M CARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND HEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK E GUZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLENE MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DERRICK SCHOFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM SITTNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THURBERT E BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN HARVILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF GEORGIAS COMPOSITE MEDICAL BOARD INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY C DOZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH DRAPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor NATHAN DEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE UPTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM WETHERINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLY NICHOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J CHAD KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA REGENTS UNIVERSITY SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM F AMIDED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASEY CAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA DUNCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?