FORD v. BASS AND ASSOCIATES et al
Plaintiff: ANGELES FORD
Defendant: BASS AND ASSOCIATES and HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE
Case Number: 5:2019cv00159
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE identifying Other Affiliate GOOD VOCATIONS INC, Other Affiliate GOODWILL WORKS FOUNDATION INC, Other Affiliate HELMS EDUCATION INC, Other Affiliate HELMS LLC, Other Affiliate GOODWILL STAFFING SERVICES OF MIDDLE GEORGIA AND THE CSRA LLC for HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE. (FOX, JOHN)
July 2, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. (ans)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Jurisdictional Statement by HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE (FOX, JOHN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE (FOX, JOHN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE with Jury Demand. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by ANGELES FORD.(FOX, JOHN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANGELES FORD as to BASS AND ASSOCIATES. (cma)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint Filed by ANGELES FORD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(cma) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #2 Signed Motion, #3 Signed Memorandum) (cma).
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement by HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE filed by JOHN P FOX.(FOX, JOHN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for More Definite Statement by HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE filed by JOHN P FOX. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(FOX, JOHN)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE. as to HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE (FOX, JOHN)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ANGELES FORD (ans)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons BASS AND ASSOCIATES PC)(ans)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number GAM500031661,filed by ANGELES FORD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ans)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORD v. BASS AND ASSOCIATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELES FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASS AND ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HELMS CAREER INSTITUTE
Represented By: JOHN P FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?