DIAZ v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: Adrian Diaz
Defendant: Commissioner of social security
Not Yet Classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2019cv00169
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (ans)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (ans)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ans)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, ATTORNEY GENERAL and CIVIL PROCESS CLERK (ans)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 05/07/19 (ans)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ans)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrian Diaz filed by JOEL JEROME HUMPHRIES. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM 285). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(HUMPHRIES, JOEL)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Commissioner of social security filed by Adrian Diaz (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HUMPHRIES, JOEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIAZ v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of social security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Diaz
Represented By: JOEL JEROME HUMPHRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?