RHOTON v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Rhoton
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, Dean Foods Company and CIGNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00181
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent CONNECTICUT GENERAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent CIGNA HOLDINGS INC for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (BONDURANT, ELIZABETH)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(BONDURANT, ELIZABETH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION For Extenstion of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ANTHONY RHOTON (SHIPLEY, JAMES)
June 7, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Acknowledgment of Service filed by ANTHONY RHOTON ); Wrong event used, the correct event is "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED" - NO NEED TO REFILE, docket entry corrected by case manager. (ggs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to DEAN FOODS COMPANY filed by ANTHONY RHOTON. (SHIPLEY, JAMES) Modified on 6/7/2019 to correct event.(ggs).
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (PERRY, JOHN)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOHN GREGORY PERRY on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Attorney JOHN GREGORY PERRY added to party LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA(pty:dft) (PERRY, JOHN)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ELIZABETH J BONDURANT on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Attorney ELIZABETH J BONDURANT added to party LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA(pty:dft) (BONDURANT, ELIZABETH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to CIGNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY by ANTHONY RHOTON (SHIPLEY, JAMES) Modified on 6/5/2019 to add applicable party. (ggs).
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by ANTHONY RHOTON. (SHIPLEY, JAMES)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by ANTHONY RHOTON. (SHIPLEY, JAMES)
May 22, 2019 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by JAMES EVERETT SHIPLEY, JR (nop)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ANTHONY RHOTON (ggs)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CIGNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, DEAN FOODS COMPANY, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons DEAN FOODS COMPANY, #2 Summons CIGNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY)(ggs)
May 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ANTHONY RHOTON ); Notice to Counsel - JACOB WOODARD POOLE Your contact information (Address, telephone number, etc.) in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (ggs)
May 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by ANTHONY RHOTON ); Notice to Counsel - JOHN BELL MANLY Your contact information (Address, telephone, etc.) in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (ggs)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL JAMES E SHIPLEY, JR - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
May 14, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Anthony Rhoton ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Not all defendants were included during case opening. NO NEED TO REFILE, docket corrected by case manager and defendant added to case. (ggs)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3159077, $400 filed by Anthony Rhoton (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Life Insurance Company of North America Summons, #3 Summons Cigna Insurance Company Summons, #4 Summons Dean Foods Company Summons)(MANLY, JOHN) Modified on 5/14/2019 to edit docket text (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RHOTON v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: ELIZABETH J BONDURANT
Represented By: JOHN GREGORY PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rhoton
Represented By: JAMES EVERETT SHIPLEY, JR
Represented By: JACOB WOODARD POOLE
Represented By: JOHN BELL MANLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?