SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS v. KNIGHT et al
Plaintiff: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Defendant: CRAWFORD G PEACE, JR, TIAMBER KNIGHT, HEATHER M HARRIS and BARBARA PEACE
Case Number: 5:2019cv00186
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Answer to Complaint, filed by CRAWFORD G PEACE, JR, HEATHER M HARRIS, BARBARA PEACE ); Notice to Counsel - Jason D. Lewis - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (vs)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by HEATHER M HARRIS, BARBARA PEACE, CRAWFORD G PEACE, JR.(LEWIS, JASON)Attorney JASON D LEWIS added to party HEATHER M HARRIS(pty:dft), Attorney JASON D LEWIS added to party BARBARA PEACE(pty:dft), Attorney JASON D LEWIS added to party CRAWFORD G PEACE, JR(pty:dft)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Answer to Complaint (MILLER, STEVAN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. as to HEATHER M HARRIS (MILLER, STEVAN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. as to CRAWFORD G PEACE, JR (MILLER, STEVAN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. as to BARBARA PEACE (MILLER, STEVAN)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by TIAMBER KNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(DOZIER, J W)
June 20, 2019 Second Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Answer to Complaint filed by TIAMBER KNIGHT ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. Also the Document must include the Civil Action Number 5:19-cv-00186-MTT. (vs)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by TIAMBER KNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(DOZIER, J W)
June 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Complaint filed by TIAMBER KNIGHT ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. (vs)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by TIAMBER KNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(DOZIER, J W)Attorney J W DAVID DOZIER added to party TIAMBER KNIGHT(pty:dft)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS (MILLER, STEVAN)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BARBARA PEACE, HEATHER M HARRIS, TIAMBER KNIGHT, CRAWFORD G PEACE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Summons CRAWFORD G PEACE JR, #2 Summons HEATHER M HARRIS, #3 Summons TIAMBER KNIGHT)(ans)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS (ans)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC, Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC, Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC, Corporate Parent LIBERTY INSURANCE HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY for SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (MILLER, STEVAN)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEATHER M HARRIS, TIAMBER KNIGHT, BARBARA PEACE, CRAWFORD G PEACE, JR Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3163426, $400 filed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B1 - Reservation of Rights Letter to Peace, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B2 - Reservation of Rights to Harris, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Redacted Insurance Policy, #6 Summons Summons for Barbara Peace, #7 Summons Summons for Crawford Peace, #8 Summons Summons for Heather Harris, #9 Summons Summons for Tiamber Knight)(MILLER, STEVAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS v. KNIGHT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: STEVAN A MILLER
Represented By: M RYAN DEL CAMPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAWFORD G PEACE, JR
Represented By: Jason David Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAMBER KNIGHT
Represented By: J W DAVID DOZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER M HARRIS
Represented By: Jason David Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA PEACE
Represented By: Jason David Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?