PYRAMID ROOFING & WINDOWS LLC v. PERKINS et al
Plaintiff: PYRAMID ROOFING & WINDOWS LLC
Defendant: CORY PERKINS, PYRAMID ROOFING INC and KELLY NICOLE
Case Number: 5:2019cv00216
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PYRAMID ROOFING & WINDOWS LLC. Related document: #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by PYRAMID ROOFING INC, KELLY NICOLE, CORY PERKINS.(DEMOTT, MATTHEW)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PYRAMID ROOFING INC (ALDERMAN, SAMUEL)
July 17, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by PYRAMID ROOFING INC, KELLY NICOLE, CORY PERKINS ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (vs)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint(), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by KELLY NICOLE, PYRAMID ROOFING INC, CORY PERKINS with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement)(ALDERMAN, SAMUEL) Modified on 7/15/2019 to add Exhibit Description(vs).
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Of Time To Answer by KELLY NICOLE, CORY PERKINS, PYRAMID ROOFING INC (DEAL, MICHAEL)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by KELLY NICOLE, CORY PERKINS, PYRAMID ROOFING INC. (DEAL, MICHAEL)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CORY PERKINS, PYRAMID ROOFING INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Pyramid Roofing, Inc. c/o Cory Perkins)(vs)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PYRAMID ROOFING & WINDOWS LLC as to CORY PERKINS. (DEMOTT, MATTHEW)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to KELLY NICOLE, CORY PERKINS, PYRAMID ROOFING INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kelly Nicole, #2 Summons Pyramid Roofing Inc.)(vs)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to PYRAMID ROOFING & WINDOWS LLC (vs)
June 6, 2019 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER no longer assigned to the case. (vs)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO the Macon Division pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement. (mdm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pyramid Roofing & Windows, LLC (DEMOTT, MATTHEW)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3178661, $400 filed by Pyramid Roofing & Windows, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Trademark Registration S-29566, #2 Exhibit State Trademark Registration S-29567, #3 Exhibit State Trademark Registration S-29568, #4 Exhibit State Trademark Registration S-29569, #5 Exhibit State Trademark Registration S-29570, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons for Cory Perkins, #8 Summons Summons for Pyramid Roofing, Inc., #9 Summons Summons for Kelly Nicole)(DEMOTT, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PYRAMID ROOFING & WINDOWS LLC v. PERKINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORY PERKINS
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES DEAL
Represented By: SAMUEL G ALDERMAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYRAMID ROOFING INC
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES DEAL
Represented By: SAMUEL G ALDERMAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY NICOLE
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES DEAL
Represented By: SAMUEL G ALDERMAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PYRAMID ROOFING & WINDOWS LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW E EUTZLER
Represented By: MATTHEW DREW DEMOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?