BEY v. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY
Defendant: LIEUTENANT JEFFERSON, COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY C WARD, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CLINTON PERRY, REGIONAL DIRECTOR SCOTT CRICKMAR, LACHAKA MCKENZIE, DEPUTY WARDEN PETER EADDIE and DEPUTY WARDEN SALES
Case Number: 5:2019cv00236
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of and by YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cma)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of and by YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cma)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION and AFFIDAVI for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Plaintiff to submit a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis using this Courts standard form and to provide the certified copy of his trust account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his Complaint within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff an application to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 07/16/2019. (vs)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT(S) LIST by YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Truth Affidavit, #2 Exhibit C - Truth Affidavit, #3 Exhibit D - Letter, #4 Exhibit E - Prison Legal News, #5 Exhibit F - Medical Complaint, #6 Exhibit G - Health Services Request Form, #7 Exhibit H - Incident Report, #8 Exhibit I - Statement of Facts, #9 Envelope)(vs)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing proposed summons by YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY (vs)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCOTT CRICKMAR, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, PETER EADDIE, GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JEFFERSON, LACHAKA MCKENZIE, CLINTON PERRY, SALES, TIMOTHY C WARD,filed by YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Denial of Corporate Existence, #2 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEY v. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUSUFU KUUMBA BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT JEFFERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY C WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONAL DIRECTOR SCOTT CRICKMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LACHAKA MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN PETER EADDIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN SALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?