WILLIAMS v. DOZIER et al

Petitioner: GRADY RENARD WILLIAMS, JR
Respondent: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and GREGORY C DOZIER
Case Number: 5:2019cv00240
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01254. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Truth by GRADY RENARD WILLIAMS, JR (zrdj) Modified filed date on 6/4/2019 (znmw). [Transferred from dcd on 6/17/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Middle District of Georgia. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/16/2019. (zeg) [Transferred from dcd on 6/17/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GRADY RENARD WILLIAMS, JR (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 6/17/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by GRADY RENARD WILLIAMS, JR. (Attachment: #1 Supplement)(zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 6/17/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/29/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 6/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. DOZIER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GRADY RENARD WILLIAMS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GREGORY C DOZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?