TORRES-AGUIRRE v. WALTON et al
Petitioner: JONATHON TORRES-AGUIRRE
Respondent: Officer WALTON and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00249
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to File Prisoner Account Statement (Certified Copy). The Clerk is directed to provide Petitioner with the appropriate form. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-15-19. (jdl)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ans)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02638. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
June 20, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Janet F. King terminated from case. (tmf) [Transferred from gand on 6/20/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathon Torres-Aguirre re #3 Order. (tmf) [Transferred from gand on 6/20/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to adjust this Court's docket to show that this is a federal habeas corpus petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241. IT IS ORDERED that this action, including all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings, and exhibits filed herein (if any), is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, the Macon Division. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 6/20/2019. (tmf) [Transferred from gand on 6/20/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 6/20/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathon Torres-Aguirre. (No Authorization Signature) (eop) [Transferred from gand on 6/20/2019.] Modified event type on 6/20/2019 (ans).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jonathon Torres-Aguirre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #3 -Complete Complaint -) (eop). [Transferred from gand on 6/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TORRES-AGUIRRE v. WALTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer WALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JONATHON TORRES-AGUIRRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?