CENTER v. INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JEFFREY CENTER
Defendant: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00258
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by JEFFREY CENTER re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Affidavit Decl of Bradley in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 1 to Decl of Bradley - Michio-Ingersoll Email Chain, #5 Exhibit 2 to Decl of Bradley - Ingersoll Letter, #6 Exhibit 3 to Decl of Bradley - Mabry Trial Court Order)(BRADLEY, JAMES)
July 25, 2019 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. The response and reply deadlines have been reset. (ggs)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 Letter regarding Extension of Deadline Under Local Rule 6.2 re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (BRITT, NINA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agent Profile, #2 Exhibit Client Information Page, #3 Exhibit Policy, #4 Exhibit Affidavit)(Parsons, Erica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent National General Management Corp. for INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Parsons, Erica)
July 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #15 Memorandum in Support filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY): Document is a statement of material Facts and not a memorandum in support. The statement of material facts should be pulled in as an attachment to the applicable motion and not filed as a separate docket entry. DO NOT REFILE, docket entry corrected by case manager to reflect the correct title of the document.(ggs)
July 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Memorandum in Support filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY); Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s). ADDITIONALLY, a memorandum in support should be pulled in as an attachment to the applicable motion. DO NOT REFILE THE MOTION, simply refile the memorandum in support and include a description of the exhibits. Generic descriptions (i.e. Exhibit A, etc.) are not allowed. (ggs)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint. (Parsons, Erica) Modified on 7/19/2019 to correct title of document. (ggs).
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Parsons, Erica)
July 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. This is accomplished during the filing process. (ggs)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed by Erica L. Parsons.(Parsons, Erica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Parsons, Erica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Parsons, Erica)Attorney Erica L. Parsons added to party INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (pty:dft)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by KIMBERLY KEEVERS PALMER (nop)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JAMES C BRADLEY (nop)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by NINA FIELDS BRITT (nop)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MICHAEL J BRICKMAN (nop)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JEFFREY CENTER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3208395, $100 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(PALMER, KIMBERLY)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JEFFREY CENTER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3208391, $100 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(BRADLEY, JAMES)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JEFFREY CENTER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3208386, $100 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(BRITT, NINA)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JEFFREY CENTER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3208356, $100 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(BRICKMAN, MICHAEL)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (ggs)
June 27, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by JEFFREY CENTER ); Civil Cover Sheet not attached. Please provide via e-mail to the Clerk's Office.(ggs)
June 27, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by JEFFREY CENTER ); Notice to Counsel - (C. COOPER KNOWLES) Your contact information (address) in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (ggs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3197416, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (PRINCENTHAL, ADAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment A - VIII. Related Cases) (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER v. INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Erica L. Parsons
Represented By: SAMUEL H SABULIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY CENTER
Represented By: C COOPER KNOWLES
Represented By: KIMBERLY KEEVERS PALMER
Represented By: RICHARD KOPELMAN
Represented By: JAMES C BRADLEY
Represented By: ADAM P PRINCENTHAL
Represented By: CLINTON W SITTON
Represented By: MICHAEL J BRICKMAN
Represented By: NINA FIELDS BRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?