MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC et al v. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC, LARRY DORSEY, CHERYL DORSEY and DORSEY
Defendant: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00261
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 2/11/2020. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 3/13/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 8/16/2019. (kat)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TERMINATING #6 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 8/14/2019. (kat)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint/Petition by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand. Related document: #9 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC.(KENDALL, MICHAEL)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : (TURNBULL, RACHEL)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED #1 Notice of Removal, against All Defendants by MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC (TURNBULL, RACHEL)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/19/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
July 3, 2019 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR*** Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Answer to Complaint filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required corporate disclosures and jurisdictional statement immediately. (ggs) Modified on 7/8/2019 (ggs).
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(KENDALL, MICHAEL)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY filed by MICHAEL C KENDALL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Auto-Owners Insurance Company's Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss)(KENDALL, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC (TURNBULL, RACHEL)
June 27, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. ATTN: MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC, please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (ggs)
June 27, 2019 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR*** Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (ggs) Modified on 7/5/2019 (ggs).
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (KENDALL, MICHAEL)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (KENDALL, MICHAEL)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3197668, $400 filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal (Dist. Ct.), #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal (State Court), #4 Required Form Notice of Filing Removal (Dist. Ct.), #5 Required Form Certificate, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KENDALL, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC et al v. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTEZUMA WELDING AND RADIATOR WORKS INC
Represented By: RACHEL R TURNBULL
Represented By: LEE M GILLIS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY DORSEY
Represented By: RACHEL R TURNBULL
Represented By: LEE M GILLIS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL DORSEY
Represented By: RACHEL R TURNBULL
Represented By: LEE M GILLIS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORSEY
Represented By: RACHEL R TURNBULL
Represented By: LEE M GILLIS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL C KENDALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?