HARRIS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: Tammy S. Harris and TAMMY S HARRIS
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Yet Classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2019cv00269
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (ans)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, #2 USM 285 Attorney General)(vs)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney (Civil Process Clerk), U.S. Attorney General, and ORCC (ans)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Civil Process Clerk), U.S. Attorney General, and ORCC (ans)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 07/09/19 (ans) Modified on 7/10/2019 (ans).
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 ***DOCKET ENTRY MADE IN WRONG CASE*** Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney General, and ORCC (ans)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TAMMY S HARRIS (ans)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ans)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tammy S. Harris filed by JOHN V HOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Application to File IFP, #2 Summons Atty Gen, #3 Summons Defendant, #4 Summons US Atty). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(HOGAN, JOHN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against ANDREW SAUL filed by Tammy S. Harris (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HOGAN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy S. Harris
Represented By: JOHN V HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY S HARRIS
Represented By: JOHN V HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?