KITCHEN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: BRENDA KITCHEN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY and SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2019cv00270
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (vs)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, #2 USM 285 Attorney General)(vs)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. All parties having consented pursuant to 28 USC 636(c)(1) for a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct any and all proceedings in connection with this action, including but not limited to, the trial of said case and the ordering of the entry of judgment herein; this case is hereby reassigned to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE for all further proceedings. (vs)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (OSTERHOUT, KARL)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by KARL E OSTERHOUT (nop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Office of the Regional Chief Counsel)(vs)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Attorney General, #2 USM 285 Office of the Regional Chief Counsel)(vs)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service shall be made as provided by law, and the Clerk of Court is directed to serve Defendant with all pleadings, motions, and orders heretofore entered, if any. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 07/09/2019 (vs)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by BRENDA KITCHEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3206573, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(OSTERHOUT, KARL)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BRENDA KITCHEN (vs)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRENDA KITCHEN filed by KATHLEEN MARIE FLYNN. (Attachments: #1 USM 285, #2 USM 285, #3 USM 285, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(FLYNN, KATHLEEN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by BRENDA KITCHEN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(FLYNN, KATHLEEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KITCHEN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA KITCHEN
Represented By: KATHLEEN MARIE FLYNN
Represented By: KARL E OSTERHOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?