5201 HOUSTON RD LLC v. CYPRESS INSURANCE CO
Plaintiff: 5201 HOUSTON ROAD LLC
Defendant: CYPRESS INSURANCE CO
Case Number: 5:2019cv00299
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/26/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BRIAN E DEVILLING (nop)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Jurisdictional Statement by 5201 HOUSTON ROAD LLC (BUFORD, FLOYD)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5201 HOUSTON ROAD LLC (BUFORD, FLOYD)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by FLOYD M BUFORD, JR on behalf of 5201 HOUSTON ROAD LLC Attorney FLOYD M BUFORD, JR added to party 5201 HOUSTON ROAD LLC(pty:pla) (BUFORD, FLOYD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Statement by CYPRESS INSURANCE CO (TAYLOR, WAYNE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CYPRESS INSURANCE CO identifying Other Affiliate BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY INC for CYPRESS INSURANCE CO. (TAYLOR, WAYNE)
August 13, 2019 Notice to Counsel JOSHUA A HALE; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediatelyPursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (ans)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MATTHEW S PONZI (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CYPRESS INSURANCE CO Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3231341, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(PONZI, MATTHEW)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CYPRESS INSURANCE CO Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3231335, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DEVILLING, BRIAN)
August 5, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal (IFP) filed by CYPRESS INSURANCE CO ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (ans)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Petition by CYPRESS INSURANCE CO. Related document: #3 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by CYPRESS INSURANCE CO.(TAYLOR, WAYNE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED #1 Notice of Removal (IFP) against 5201 HOUSTON ROAD LLC by CYPRESS INSURANCE CO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint)(TAYLOR, WAYNE)
July 26, 2019 Filing fee Paid: Filing Fee $400 Receipt #AGAMDC-3221066 (ans)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CYPRESS INSURANCE CO (ans)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL MATTHEW S PONZI and BRIAN DEVILLING - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ans)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (IFP) against 5201 Houston Road, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(SHERMAN, MICHELLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 5201 HOUSTON RD LLC v. CYPRESS INSURANCE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRESS INSURANCE CO
Represented By: WAYNE D TAYLOR
Represented By: MICHELLE ALAMEDA SHERMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW S PONZI
Represented By: BRIAN E DEVILLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5201 HOUSTON ROAD LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW S PONZI
Represented By: BRIAN DEVILLING
Represented By: FLOYD M BUFORD, JR
Represented By: JOSHUA HALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?