GREEN v. SMITH
Plaintiff: DAVID KEITH GREEN
Defendant: SHERIFF THOMAS SMITH
Case Number: 5:2019cv00370
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $50.67. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-5-19. (rcg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DAVID KEITH GREEN (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) Modified on 11/5/2019 to change docket text (vs).
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from David Green requesting status of case. ***Mailed copy of Docket Sheet *** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DAVID KEITH GREEN (vs)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS SMITH,filed by DAVID KEITH GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID KEITH GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF THOMAS SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?