SHAREEF
Appellant: KHALILAH A SHAREEF, KHALILAH SHAREEF ESTATE and WILLIAM LINDY REID
Not Yet Classified: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Case Number: 5:2019cv00375
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT in favor of US TRUSTEE - MAC, JOY R. WEBSTER, KYLE GEORGE against KHALILAH A SHAREEF (cma)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Response construed as a Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss case, DISMISSING case without prejudice, and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 11/6/2019. (ech)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS/RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by KHALILAH A SHAREEF (cma) Modified on 11/7/2019 Response construed as a Motion (cma).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Appellant's response deadline is November 7, 2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 10/23/2019. (ech)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED Letter Regarding Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule to All Parties (cma)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Regarding Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule to All Parties. (cma)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of BANKRUPTCY APPEAL RECORD filed Bankruptcy APPEAL RECORD including docket sheet and trial exhibits attached. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these appeal documents.** (Waite, Teresa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED to Case Attorneys of Record and Court Users*** Letter (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Documents, #2 Envelope)(cma)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by KHALILAH A SHAREEF (Waite, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAREEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KHALILAH A SHAREEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KHALILAH SHAREEF ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WILLIAM LINDY REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLERK KYLE GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?