FORD v. PERRY
Plaintiff: ALONZO RICO FORD
Defendant: CLINTON PERRY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00376
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ALONZO RICO FORD (vs)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ALONZO RICO FORD (vs)
September 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to US Magistrate Judge. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
September 18, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE. (vs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02406. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
September 18, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alonzo Rico Ford re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Case transferred electronically to District of Middle District Georgia-Macon. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court thus ADOPTS the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation (Dkt. #3 ) and TRANSFERS this case to the Macon Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/17/19. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Alonzo Rico Ford, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alonzo Rico Ford re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alonzo Rico Ford re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 5/31/19. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING re #1 Complaint, be TRANSFERRED to the Macon Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 5/31/19. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis/Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Alonzo Rico Ford. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.] Modified on 9/18/2019 to add docket text(vs).
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alonzo Rico Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 9/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORD v. PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALONZO RICO FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?