EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION
Plaintiff: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Defendant: AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv00381
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD - DUPLICATE FILED IN ERROR*** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. as to AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION (FLEGAL, ROBYN) Modified on 10/8/2019 (ggs).
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. as to AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION (FLEGAL, ROBYN)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PETER N FARLEY on behalf of AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION Attorney PETER N FARLEY added to party AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION(pty:dft) (FARLEY, PETER)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (ggs)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FLEGAL, ROBYN) Modified on 9/20/2019 to edit docket text. (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: ROBYN M FLEGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?