REED, et al. v. LONG, et al.
Plaintiff: COREY MCCLENDON, CHRISTOPHER REED and REGINALD HOLDEN
Defendant: JEANETTE RILEY, GARY LONG and JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Case Number: 5:2019cv00385
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/23/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10-24-19, before Judge Treadwell. Court Reporter Tammy W. DiRocco. Volume Number: 1 of 1. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Tammy W. DiRocco)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL: Telephone Conference held on 11/6/2019. Court Reporter: Darlene Fuller. (kat)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 ***RESTRICTED to Case Attorneys of Record and Court Users*** (ans)
November 6, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 2:00 PM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL. Call-in instructions emailed to parties. (kat)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING in part #6 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/29/2019. (kat)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response filed by REGINALD HOLDEN, COREY MCCLENDON, CHRISTOPHER REED re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (YURACHEK, MARK)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by GARY LONG, JEANETTE RILEY re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Waymire, Jason)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBIT(S) - 10/25/2019 email from non-party re 13 Order. (kat)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER: The Court received the email linked to this Order. The Court intends to take no action concerning this communication, and no response from the parties is necessary. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/25/2019. (kat)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2019 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by COREY MCCLENDON, REGINALD HOLDEN, CHRISTOPHER REED (Court Reporter Tammy DiRocco.) Court Reporter: Tammy DiRocco.Time in Court: 2 hours/ 50 minutes. (Attachments: #1 Court's Exhibit List, #2 Court's Exhibit 1 10/21/19 Facebook Post - Re-elect Gary Long, Butts County Sheriff, #3 Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #4 Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 Notice to Registrants, #5 Plaintiff's Exhibit 2a Photo of sign in front of Plaintiff McClendon's residence, #6 Plaintiff's Exhibit 2b Photo of sign in front of Plaintiff McClendon's residence, #7 Plaintiff Exhibit 2c Photo of sign in front of Plaintiff McClendon's residence, #8 Plaintiff Exhibit 3 10/27 /18 Facebook post - Butts County Sheriff's Office, #9 Plaintiff's Exhibit 4 Butts County, GA Code of Ordinances, Sec. 101-502 - Development standards for streets, #10 Defendant's Exhibit List, #11 Defendant's Exhibit 1Warning Sign - Butts County Sheriff's Office, #12 Defendant's Exhibit 2 Aerial view of Plaintiff Reed's residence, #13 Defendant's Exhibit 3 Aerial view of Plaintiff Holden's residence, #14 Defendant's Exhibit 4 Aerial view of Plaintiff McClendon's residence, #15 Defendant's Exhibit 5 Warranty Deed - Lester Reed, #16 Defendant's Exhibit 6 Plat related to lot in Exhibit 5, #17 Defendant's Exhibit 6a Exhibit 6 with identifying marks (circles), #18 Defendant's Exhibit 7 Limited Warranty Deed - Reginald Holden, #19 Defendant's Exhibit 8 Plat related to lot in Exhibit 7, #20 Defendant's Exhibit 8a Exhibit 8 with identifying marks (circles), #21 Defendant's Exhibit 9 Warranty Deed - Willie and Linda Mcclendon, #22 Defendant's Exhibit 10Plat related to lot in Exhibit 9, #23 Defendant's Exhibit 10 a Exhibit 10 with identifying marks (circles)) (cma)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint/Petition by GARY LONG, JEANETTE RILEY with Jury Demand. Related document: #5 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by COREY MCCLENDON, REGINALD HOLDEN, CHRISTOPHER REED.(Waymire, Jason)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by GARY LONG, JEANETTE RILEY re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Waymire, Jason)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL: Telephone Conference held on 10/18/2019. The Court will schedule a motion hearing for 10/24/19 at 9:30 am. Defendants SHALL file by 10/22/19 a brief in response to Plaintiffs' motion #6 . Court Reporter: Darlene Fuller. (kat)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2019 at 9:30 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL. (kat)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TERRY E WILLIAMS on behalf of GARY LONG, JEANETTE RILEY Attorney TERRY E WILLIAMS added to party GARY LONG(pty:dft), Attorney TERRY E WILLIAMS added to party JEANETTE RILEY(pty:dft) (WILLIAMS, TERRY)
October 16, 2019 ***TIME CHANGE ONLY*** NOTICE OF RESETTING Telephone Conference RESET for 10/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL. (kat)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL. Call-in instructions emailed to parties. (kat)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C. Waymire on behalf of GARY LONG, JEANETTE RILEY Attorney Jason C. Waymire added to party GARY LONG(pty:dft), Attorney Jason C. Waymire added to party JEANETTE RILEY(pty:dft) (Waymire, Jason)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by REGINALD HOLDEN, COREY MCCLENDON, CHRISTOPHER REED filed by MARK YURACHEK.(YURACHEK, MARK)
October 6, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, GARY LONG, JEANETTE RILEY by CHRISTOPHER REED, REGINALD HOLDEN, COREY MCCLENDON (YURACHEK, MARK)
October 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER REED, REGINALD HOLDEN, COREY MCCLENDON as to GARY LONG, JEANETTE RILEY. (YURACHEK, MARK)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to REGINALD HOLDEN, COREY MCCLENDON, and CHRISTOPHER REED (cma)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GARY LONG and JEANETTE RILEY. (Attachments: #1 Riley)(cma)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GARY LONG, JEANETTE RILEY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3272225, $400 filed by CHRISTOPHER REED, REGINALD HOLDEN, COREY MCCLENDON (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(YURACHEK, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REED, et al. v. LONG, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANETTE RILEY
Represented By: TERRY E WILLIAMS
Represented By: Jason C. Waymire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY LONG
Represented By: TERRY E WILLIAMS
Represented By: Jason C. Waymire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY MCCLENDON
Represented By: MARK YURACHEK
Represented By: MARK A BEGNAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER REED
Represented By: MARK YURACHEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINALD HOLDEN
Represented By: MARK YURACHEK
Represented By: MARK A BEGNAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?