LANGE v. HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: ANNA LANGE
Defendant: H. JAY WALKER, III, HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA, HOUSTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, TOM MCMICHAEL, Commissioner TOMMY STALNAKER, GAIL ROBINSON, KENNETH CARTER, LARRY THOMPSON, BARRY HOLLAND and ROBBIE DUNBAR
Case Number: 5:2019cv00392
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL. Call-in instructions emailed to the parties. (kat)
November 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANNA LANGE filed by KENNETH E BARTON, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Supp. of Motion for Injunction, #2 Exhibit Lange Declaration, #3 Exhibit Bluebond-Langner Declaration, #4 Exhibit Lewis Declaration, #5 Exhibit Schechter Declaration)(BARTON, KENNETH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SHARON P MORGAN on behalf of All Defendants Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party KENNETH CARTER(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party ROBBIE DUNBAR(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party BARRY HOLLAND(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party HOUSTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party TOM MCMICHAEL(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party GAIL ROBINSON(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party TOMMY STALNAKER(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party LARRY THOMPSON(pty:dft), Attorney SHARON P MORGAN added to party H. JAY WALKER, III(pty:dft) (MORGAN, SHARON)
November 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT on behalf of All Defendants Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party KENNETH CARTER(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party ROBBIE DUNBAR(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party BARRY HOLLAND(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party HOUSTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party TOM MCMICHAEL(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party GAIL ROBINSON(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party TOMMY STALNAKER(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party LARRY THOMPSON(pty:dft), Attorney RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT added to party H. JAY WALKER, III(pty:dft) (GIGNILLIAT, RICHARD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick L. Lail on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party KENNETH CARTER(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party ROBBIE DUNBAR(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party BARRY HOLLAND(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party HOUSTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party TOM MCMICHAEL(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party GAIL ROBINSON(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party TOMMY STALNAKER(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party LARRY THOMPSON(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick L. Lail added to party H. JAY WALKER, III(pty:dft) (Lail, Patrick)
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS by KENNETH CARTER, ROBBIE DUNBAR, BARRY HOLLAND, HOUSTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA, TOM MCMICHAEL, GAIL ROBINSON, TOMMY STALNAKER, LARRY THOMPSON, H. JAY WALKER, III (MORGAN, SHARON)
November 1, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANNA LANGE. as to BARRY HOLLAND (BARTON, KENNETH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANNA LANGE. as to LARRY THOMPSON (BARTON, KENNETH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANNA LANGE. as to ROBBIE DUNBAR (BARTON, KENNETH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANNA LANGE. as to H. JAY WALKER, III (BARTON, KENNETH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANNA LANGE. as to GAIL ROBINSON (BARTON, KENNETH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANNA LANGE. as to TOMMY STALNAKER (BARTON, KENNETH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANNA LANGE. as to KENNETH CARTER (BARTON, KENNETH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANNA LANGE. as to TOM MCMICHAEL (BARTON, KENNETH)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DAVID BROWN (nop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ANNA LANGE Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3299956, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Kenneth E. Barton III, Ga. State Bar No. 301171. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing District of North Dakota)(BROWN, DAVID)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by WESLEY POWELL (ans)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by KEVIN BARRY (ans)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JILL K GRANT (ans)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MARY EATON (ans)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ANNA LANGE Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3287634, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Kenneth E. Barton III; State Bar No. 301171. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(POWELL, WESLEY)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ANNA LANGE Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3287156, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Kenneth E. Barton III Ga. State Bar No. 301171. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing D.Conn. Cert. Good Standing)(BARRY, KEVIN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ANNA LANGE Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3286679, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Kenneth E. Barton III; State Bar No. 301171. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(GRANT, JILL)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ANNA LANGE Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3286675, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Kenneth E. Barton III; State Bar No. 301171. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(EATON, MARY)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by NOAH E LEWIS (nop)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ANNA LANGE Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3283244, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Kenneth E. Barton III Ga. State Bar No. 301171. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing SDNY Cert. Good Standing)(LEWIS, NOAH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ANNA LANGE (vs)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KENNETH CARTER, ROBBIE DUNBAR, BARRY HOLLAND, HOUSTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA, TOM MCMICHAEL, GAIL ROBINSON, TOMMY STALNAKER, LARRY THOMPSON, H. JAY WALKER, III. (Attachments: #1 Summons Robbie Dunbar, #2 Summons Barry Holland, #3 Summons Tom McMichael, #4 Summons Larry Thomson, #5 Summons Gail Robinson, #6 Summons H. Jay Walker, #7 Summons Tommy Stalnaker, #8 Summons Houston County, Georgia, #9 Summons Houston County Board of Commissioners)(vs)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL WESLEY POWELL, MARY EATON, JILL K GRANT, DAVID BROWN, NOAH E LEWIS, KEVIN M BARRY - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (vs)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3277783, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A EEOC Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Houston County Summons, #4 Summons Board of Commissioners Summons, #5 Summons Stalnaker Summons, #6 Summons Walker Summons, #7 Summons Robinson Summons, #8 Summons Thomson Summons, #9 Summons McMichael Summons, #10 Summons Holland Summons, #11 Summons Dunbar Summons, #12 Summons Carter Summons)(BARTON, KENNETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANGE v. HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. JAY WALKER, III
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY, GEORGIA
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM MCMICHAEL
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner TOMMY STALNAKER
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAIL ROBINSON
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH CARTER
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY THOMPSON
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY HOLLAND
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBBIE DUNBAR
Represented By: SHARON P MORGAN
Represented By: Patrick L. Lail
Represented By: RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA LANGE
Represented By: KENNETH E BARTON, III
Represented By: NOAH E LEWIS
Represented By: JILL K GRANT
Represented By: MARY EATON
Represented By: MICHAEL DEVLIN COOPER
Represented By: DAVID BROWN
Represented By: KEVIN M BARRY
Represented By: WESLEY POWELL
Represented By: KEVIN BARRY
Represented By: NOAH ETHAN LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?