GLOVER v. NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC
Plaintiff: LORRAINE GLOVER
Defendant: NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00407
Filed: October 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 REMARK: Pursuant to #6 Response to Notice to Counsel, JEFFREY C TURNER has been removed as attorney of record for NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC (ans)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO COUNSEL JEFFREY C TURNER by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - New Waiver of Service reflecting signature of Jonathan K. Aust)(AUST, JONATHAN) Modified docket text on 12/2/2019 (ans).
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JONATHAN KYLE AUST on behalf of NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC Attorney JONATHAN KYLE AUST added to party NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC(pty:dft) (AUST, JONATHAN)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL JEFFREY C TURNER - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ans)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LORRAINE GLOVER. as to NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC (CARLSON, CLIFFORD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to LORRAINE GLOVER (ans)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC. (ans)
October 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3286546, $400 filed by LORRAINE GLOVER (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to National Enterprise Systems Inc)(CARLSON, CLIFFORD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLOVER v. NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORRAINE GLOVER
Represented By: CLIFFORD ALVA PHILLIP CARLSON
Represented By: RONALD E DANIELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: JONATHAN KYLE AUST
Represented By: JEFFREY C TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?