BEDGOOD v. TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Plaintiff: ALEX BEDGOOD
Defendant: TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00437
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/10/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY (TURNER, NATALIE)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY.(TURNER, NATALIE)Attorney NATALIE N TURNER added to party TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY(pty:dft)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALEX BEDGOOD as to TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (BLACKBURN, CALVIN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ALEX BEDGOOD (ans)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (ans)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3304772, $400 filed by ALEX BEDGOOD (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(BLACKBURN, CALVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEDGOOD v. TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: LUKE DONOHUE
Represented By: NATALIE N TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX BEDGOOD
Represented By: CALVIN W BLACKBURN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?