WRIGHT v. BALDWIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE et al
Plaintiff: SHELDON ROOSEVELT WRIGHT
Defendant: BALDWIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, Sheriff WILLIAM MASSEE, STATE OF GEORGIA, OFFICER EARL BRADLEY, SERGEANT TAMEKA GLENN FORD and CORPORAL ASHLEY SAULSBURY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00456
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Referring Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ERIC JAMES O'BRIEN on behalf of TAMEKA GLENN FORD, ASHLEY SAULSBURY Attorney ERIC JAMES O'BRIEN added to party TAMEKA GLENN FORD (pty:dft), Attorney ERIC JAMES O'BRIEN added to party ASHLEY SAULSBURY(pty:dft) (O'BRIEN, ERIC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III on behalf of TAMEKA GLENN FORD, ASHLEY SAULSBURY Attorney TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III added to party TAMEKA GLENN FORD (pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III added to party ASHLEY SAULSBURY(pty:dft) (BUCKLEY, TIMOTHY)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for TAMEKA GLENN FORD. (mdm)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for ASHLEY SAULSBURY. (mdm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for TAMEKA GLENN FORD. (mdm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for ASHLEY SAULSBURY. (mdm)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP, and Directing Service on 2 Defendants ; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by SHELDON ROOSEVELT WRIGHT. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 1/3/2020. (TQL)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by SHELDON ROOSEVELT WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Financial Records from Jackson, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(vs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff to either pay the filing fee or seek to proceed IFP. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 11/20/2019. (TQL)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SHELDON ROOSEVELT WRIGHT (vs)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BALDWIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, WILLIAM MASSEE, STATE OF GEORGIA,filed by SHELDON ROOSEVELT WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. BALDWIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALDWIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff WILLIAM MASSEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER EARL BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT TAMEKA GLENN FORD
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III
Represented By: ERIC JAMES O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORAL ASHLEY SAULSBURY
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III
Represented By: ERIC JAMES O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELDON ROOSEVELT WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?