JAMISON v. UNITED STATES MARSHAL'S SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: TEO A JAMISON
Defendant: BUTTS COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, STATE OF GEORGIA, SOUTHERN CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL and UNITED STATES MARSHAL'S SERVICE
Case Number: 5:2019cv00457
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TEO A JAMISON.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ans)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment Filed by TEO A JAMISON. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ans)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 RECAST #1 Complaint against All Defendants by TEO A JAMISON (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ans)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned - #7 Order to Show Cause sent to Teo Jamison returned as undeliverable. (Address has been updated since the original mailing. Re-mailing order to current address) (deb)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by TEO A. JAMISON as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by TEO A. JAMISON as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within twenty-one (21) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-19-19. (rcg)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Plaintiff to pay filing fee or file a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and to Recast #1 Complaint within twenty-one (21) days. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the appropriate forms. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-19-19. (rcg)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TEO A JAMISON (ggs)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen Hyles issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE With Regard to Filing of Pleadings and Other Papers re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint (ggs)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TEO A JAMISON.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TEO A JAMISON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMISON v. UNITED STATES MARSHAL'S SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEO A JAMISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTTS COUNTY DETENTION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MARSHAL'S SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?